PA SB596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
Pending: House Consumer Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for transportation fueling infrastructure development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In restructuring of electric utility industry, providing for transportation fueling infrastructure development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 596 PN 1343, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
2019-11-19HouseIn the House
2019-11-19SenateThird consideration and final passage (43-6)
2019-11-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-30SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-30SenateReported as amended
2019-04-30SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=596
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0596&pn=0665
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0596&pn=1343
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=7&theDate=10/30/2019&RollCallId=602
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=332

Bill Comments

feedback