PA SB568 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax; and providing for refund of taxes collected on fees for information retrieval services.
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for definitions and for exclusions from tax; and providing for refund of taxes collected on fees for information retrieval services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |