PA SB568 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in orphans' court divisions, further providing for appointment and purpose and for compensation; and, in incapacitated persons, providing for venue and for confidentiality and disclosure of information, further providing for petition and hearing and independent evaluation, repealing provisions relating to county of appointment and qualifications, further providing for review hearing, providing for affidavit in uncontested termination matters and for counsel, further providing for emergency guardian, repealing provisions relating to provisions similar to other estates, providing for removal and discharge of guardian, for appointment of guardian in conveyance and for bond, further providing for evidence of incapacity, for cross-examination of witnesses and for provisions concerning powers, duties and liabilities, providing for protection of person dealing with guardian, and further providing for when accounting filed, for distributions of income and principal during incapacity and for guardianship services.
Title
In orphans' court divisions, further providing for appointment and purpose and for compensation; and, in incapacitated persons, providing for venue and for confidentiality and disclosure of information, further providing for petition and hearing and independent evaluation, repealing provisions relating to county of appointment and qualifications, further providing for review hearing, providing for affidavit in uncontested termination matters and for counsel, further providing for emergency guardian, repealing provisions relating to provisions similar to other estates, providing for removal and discharge of guardian, for appointment of guardian in conveyance and for bond, further providing for evidence of incapacity, for cross-examination of witnesses and for provisions concerning powers, duties and liabilities, providing for protection of person dealing with guardian, and further providing for when accounting filed, for distributions of income and principal during incapacity and for guardianship services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 568 PN 541, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-02-08 | House | In the House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |