PA SB566 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-06 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-06 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 3, 1959 (P.L.1688, No.621), known as the Housing Finance Agency Law, further providing for the Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Title
Further providing for the Housing Affordability and Rehabilitation Enhancement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 566 PN 539, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2015-06-30 | House | In the House |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |