PA SB562 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, providing for airport land development zones.
Title
Providing for airport land development zones.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 1274, Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 594, 2021 A29370, SCAVELLO Amendment No. A-2937 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 1274, Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 594, 2021 A29370, SCAVELLO Amendment No. A-2937 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-21 | House | Removed from table |
2022-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-12-14 | House | In the House |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-10) |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (43-6) |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |