PA SB562 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-09 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 27 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-09 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), known as the Regulatory Review Act, further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for proposed regulations and procedures for review, for final-form regulations and final-omitted regulations and procedures for review and for procedures for subsequent review of disapproved final-form or final-omitted regulations by the commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 1897, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 1897, FP (Y: 109 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 731, 2015 A8087, MAHER (Y: 184 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 731, 2015 A2096, VITALI (Y: 67 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2016-05-25 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 731, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 1897, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 1897, FP (Y: 109 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 731, 2015 A8087, MAHER (Y: 184 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Floor: SB 562 PN 731, 2015 A2096, VITALI (Y: 67 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2016-05-25 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 562 PN 731, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-09 | House | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2016-10-28 | House | In the Senate |
2016-10-28 | Senate | Veto No. 6 |
2016-10-28 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (31-16) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (109-81) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-04-20 | House | In the House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |