PA SB545 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-21 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known as The Clean Streams Law, in other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering public health or environment.
Title
In other pollutions and potential pollution, providing for notice of discharge endangering public health or environment.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |