PA SB540 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, further providing for the Pennsylvania State Police; and repealing an act relating to limitation on complement of the Pennsylvania State Police.
Title
Further providing for the Pennsylvania State Police; and repealing an act relating to limitation on complement of the Pennsylvania State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-12-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-02-14 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |