PA SB524 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-15 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.
Title
In home rule and optional plan government, further providing for submission of question for election of government study commission and for limitation on enactment of ordinance or filing of petition.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02331 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02320 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 524 PN 599, Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 524 PN 599, 2021 A14890, KEARNEY Amendment No. A-1489 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02331 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02320 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 524 PN 599, Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 524 PN 599, 2021 A14890, KEARNEY Amendment No. A-1489 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-12-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-29 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-14 | House | In the House |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (34-16) |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |