PA SB511 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of September 27, 1961 (P.L.1700, No.699), known as the Pharmacy Act, further providing for authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations; and abrogating inconsistent regulations.
Title
Further providing for authority to administer injectable medications, biologicals and immunizations; and abrogating inconsistent regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended A04904 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |