PA SB501 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and providing for relinquishment of firearms and firearm licenses by convicted persons and for abandonment of firearms, weapons or ammunition; in criminal history record information, further providing for order for limited access; and, in protection from abuse, further providing for definitions, for commencement of proceedings, for hearings, for relief, for return of relinquished firearms, other weapons and ammunition and additional relief, for relinquishment for consignment sale, lawful transfer or safekeeping and for relinquishment to third party for safekeeping.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for persons not to possess, use, manufacture, control, sell or transfer firearms and providing for relinquishment of firearms and firearm licenses by convicted persons and for abandonment of firearms, weapons or ammunition; in criminal history record information, further providing for order for limited access; and, in protection from abuse, further providing for definitions, for commencement of proceedings, for hearings, for relief, for return of relinquished firearms, other weapons and ammunition and additional relief, for relinquishment for consignment sale, lawful transfer or safekeeping and for relinquishment to third party for safekeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 501 PN 1551, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2018-03-21 | House | In the House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |