PA SB49 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Act No. 12 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Act No. 12 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8659, carrying State Route 3037, also known as William Penn Avenue, over the Norfolk Southern and Lehigh Valley Rail Management rail lines in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the Reverend Andrew William Tilly, Jr., Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 8659, carrying State Route 3037, also known as William Penn Avenue, over the Norfolk Southern and Lehigh Valley Rail Management rail lines in the City of Johnstown, Cambria County, as the Reverend Andrew William Tilly, Jr., Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: SB 49 PN 31, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 49 PN 31, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: SB 49 PN 31, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 49 PN 31, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Act No. 12 of 2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-04-19 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed in House |
2021-04-19 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-03-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-05 | House | In the House |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |