PA SB489 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 18, 1998 (P.L.146, No.22), known as the Check Casher Licensing Act, further providing for definitions, for authority of department, for conditions for licensing and for fees and charges; and providing for recovery of losses due to theft and fraudulent misrepresentation.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for authority of department, for conditions for licensing and for fees and charges; and providing for recovery of losses due to theft and fraudulent misrepresentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 489 PN 1847, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: SB 489 PN 1847, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Floor: SB 489 PN 429, 2015 A7381, HARRIS, A. (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 489 PN 429, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Floor: SB 489 PN 1847, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - House - House Floor: SB 489 PN 429, 2015 A7381, HARRIS, A. (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 489 PN 429, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Act No. 45 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (50-0) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-05-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-05-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-23 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-23 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-05-18 | House | Removed from table |
2016-05-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-05-17 | House | First consideration |
2016-05-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |
2016-02-09 | House | In the House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-12-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |