PA SB486 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 152
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 8, 1982 (P.L.310, No.87), referred to as the Recorder of Deeds Fee Law, authorizing an additional fee to be imposed and used for demolition; and making an editorial change.
Title
Authorizing an additional fee to be imposed and used for demolition; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 486 PN 2065, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 486 PN 2065, FP (Y: 164 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09702 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09701 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 486 PN 987, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 486 PN 2065, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: SB 486 PN 2065, FP (Y: 164 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09702 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-09-21 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A09701 (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 486 PN 987, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 152 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (164-25) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | House | Second consideration |
2016-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |
2015-06-09 | House | In the House |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-04-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |