PA SB479 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Act No. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources' Resource Management Center, located in Conyngham Township, Columbia County, as the Edward W. Helfrick Resource Management Center.
Title
Designating the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources' Resource Management Center, located in Conyngham Township, Columbia County, as the Edward W. Helfrick Resource Management Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: SB 479 PN 437, FP (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 479 PN 437, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Floor: SB 479 PN 437, FP (Y: 178 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 479 PN 437, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Act No. 8 |
2016-02-23 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-02-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-02-10 | House | Signed in House |
2016-02-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-02-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (178-0) |
2016-02-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-02-09 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-02-09 | House | Second consideration |
2016-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2016-01-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-01-12 | House | First consideration |
2016-01-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-06-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-10 | House | In the House |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |