PA SB470 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19557, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 36 over the Redbank Creek, Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the CPT Raymond Harry "Bud" Hetrick Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 19557, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 36 over the Redbank Creek, Brookville Borough, Jefferson County, as the CPT Raymond Harry "Bud" Hetrick Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 470 PN 1226, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-10 | House | In the House |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |