PA SB450 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 30, 1987 (P.L.163, No.16), known as the Rural Pennsylvania Revitalization Act, in Center for Rural Pennsylvania, further providing for board of directors; and making a repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Center for Rural Pennsylvania, further providing for board of directors; and making a repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-08 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03643 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 450 PN 1227, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-27HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-04-27HouseSecond consideration
2022-04-26HouseRemoved from table
2022-02-08HouseLaid on the table
2022-02-08HouseFirst consideration
2022-02-08HouseReported as amended
2022-01-21HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2022-01-18HouseIn the House
2022-01-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-12-15SenateSecond consideration
2021-11-10SenateFirst consideration
2021-11-10SenateReported as amended
2021-04-09SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=450
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0450&pn=0534
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0450&pn=1227
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0450&pn=1384
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=408
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/08/2022&RollCallId=1329
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/08/2022&RollCallId=1330
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=11/10/2021&RollCallId=664

Bill Comments

feedback