PA SB45 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 21, 1937 (P.L.774, No.211), referred to as the Pennsylvania Turnpike Commission Act, further providing for emergency vehicles.
Title
Further providing for emergency vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |