PA SB435 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for snow and ice dislodged or falling from moving vehicle.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Boscola [D] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] | Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. John Blake [D] |
Sen. Judy Schwank [D] | Sen. John Yudichak [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Christine Tartaglione [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 435 PN 612, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-25 | House | In the House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |