PA SB418 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 3, 1937 (P.L.1333, No.320), known as the Pennsylvania Election Code, in ballots, further providing for number of ballots to be printed and specimen ballots.
Title
In ballots, further providing for number of ballots to be printed and specimen ballots.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 418 PN 1014, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 418 PN 1014, A2481, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2481 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 418 PN 1014, A2481, MUTH AMENDMENT NO. A-2481 (Y: 22 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-25 | House | In the House |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-19) |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |