PA SB383 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-29 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in duties and powers of boards of school directors, providing for protection and defense of pupils.
Title
In duties and powers of boards of school directors, providing for protection and defense of pupils.
Sponsors
Sen. Donald White [R] | Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. Kim Ward [R] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 383 PN 1034, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 383 PN 865, A2393, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-2393 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 383 PN 373, A1362, WHITE AMENDMENT NO. A-1362 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 383 PN 865, A2393, STREET AMENDMENT NO. A-2393 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 383 PN 373, A1362, WHITE AMENDMENT NO. A-1362 (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-06-28 | House | In the House |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-22) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-1) |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (35-15) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |