PA SB381 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 26 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission; in grounds and buildings, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; in certification of teachers, further providing for substitute teaching permit for prospective teachers; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and reimbursement of payments and for Community College Capital Fund; in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations; in miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, further providing for Public Higher Education Funding Commission; providing for intercollegiate athletics; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2021-2022; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for student-weighted basic education funding, for payments to intermediate units and for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; in construction and renovation of buildings by school entities, further providing for applicability; and making an editorial change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for Special Education Funding Commission; in grounds and buildings, further providing for limitation on new applications for Department of Education approval of public school building projects; in certification of teachers, further providing for substitute teaching permit for prospective teachers; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and reimbursement of payments and for Community College Capital Fund; in educational tax credits, further providing for limitations; in miscellaneous provisions relating to institutions of higher education, further providing for Public Higher Education Funding Commission; providing for intercollegiate athletics; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2021-2022; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for student-weighted basic education funding, for payments to intermediate units and for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; in construction and renovation of buildings by school entities, further providing for applicability; and making an editorial change.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 381 PN 972, Concur in House Amendments (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02151 (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 381 PN 972, FP (Y: 154 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01728 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 381 PN 367, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 26 of 2021
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25SenateSigned in House
2021-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (40-10)
2021-06-25SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-25SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2021-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (154-47)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported as amended
2021-06-22HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-22HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-21HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-16HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-16HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-16HouseReported as committed
2021-04-21HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2021-04-20HouseIn the House
2021-04-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (41-6)
2021-04-19SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-23SenateReported as committed
2021-03-10SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=381
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0381&pn=0367
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0381&pn=0972
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0381P0367.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/SB0381P0972.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=68
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=108
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=74
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=668
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=669
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=462
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=810
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=809
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=455
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=266

Bill Comments

feedback