PA SB379 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-25 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Passed on October 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-25 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for benevolent gestures relating to medical professional liability insurance.
Title
Providing for benevolent gestures relating to medical professional liability insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-22 - House - SB 379 PN 1279, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - SB 379 PN 1279, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Senate - SB 379 PN 1279, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-25 | House | Act No. 79 |
2013-10-25 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2013-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2013-10-23 | House | Signed in House |
2013-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2013-10-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2013-10-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-16 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2013-10-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-28 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-25 | House | In the House |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |