PA SB356 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - Act No. 150
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, providing for the definition of "farming" and further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes and for withholding and remittance.
Title
In consolidated collection of local income taxes, providing for the definition of "farming" and further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes and for withholding and remittance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 356 PN 1689, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 356 PN 1689, FP (Y: 185 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A06321 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06321 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 356 PN 887, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - House - House Floor: SB 356 PN 1689, FP (Y: 185 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A06321 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A06321 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 356 PN 887, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | Act No. 150 |
2016-11-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (47-0) |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-2) |
2016-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2016-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-07-10 | House | Removed from table |
2016-07-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-06 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-06-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-06-22 | House | In the House |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-11 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |