PA SB350 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs, for third-party review of permit decision delays and for annual reports; establishing the Pennsylvania Office of Transformation and Opportunity and the Economic Development Strategy Group; and providing for their powers and duties.
Title
Providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs, for third-party review of permit decision delays and for annual reports; establishing the Pennsylvania Office of Transformation and Opportunity and the Economic Development Strategy Group; and providing for their powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A518, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0518 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A508, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0508 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A507, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0507 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Adopt Amendment A00483 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A518, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0518 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A508, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0508 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 350 PN 718, 2023 A507, Motion to Table MUTH Amendment No. A-0507 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Adopt Amendment A00483 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Intergovernmental Operations: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2023-05-10 | House | In the House |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (29-19) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-05-08 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS |