PA SB349 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: SB 349 PN 352, 2021 A4028 (Y: 88 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 349 PN 352, Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 349 PN 352, Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-10-27 | House | In the House |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (31-19) |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |