PA SB347 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Title
In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income; and, in corporate net income tax, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended A04380 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04380 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 347 PN 350, Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A04380 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 347 PN 350, Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2021-11-09 | House | In the House |
2021-11-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (33-17) |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |