PA SB341 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on November 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-01 - Act No. 208
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, authorizing an Automotive Fuel Testing and Disclosure Program.
Title
Authorizing an Automotive Fuel Testing and Disclosure Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-17 - House - SB 341 PN 2473, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - SB 341 PN 2473, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - House - SB 341 PN 2452, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13239, PETRARCA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13233, PETRARCA (Y: 95 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13446, DUNBAR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - SB 341 PN 2036, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-16 - Senate - SB 341 PN 2473, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-15 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-03 - House - SB 341 PN 2452, FP (Y: 195 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13239, PETRARCA (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13233, PETRARCA (Y: 95 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2012-10-02 - House - SB 341 PN 2383, 2011 A13446, DUNBAR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - Senate - SB 341 PN 2036, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-01 | House | Act No. 208 |
2012-11-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2012-10-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2012-10-24 | House | Signed in House |
2012-10-17 | House | Signed in Senate |
2012-10-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments (192-0) |
2012-10-17 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2012-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2012-10-16 | House | In the House |
2012-10-16 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-0) |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2012-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-2) |
2012-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-10-02 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-10-02 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | First consideration |
2012-09-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2012-04-04 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2012-04-02 | House | In the House |
2012-04-02 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |