PA SB340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for online curriculum availability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, providing for online curriculum availability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 340 PN 1101, Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt Amendment A01993 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Amended (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION
2023-10-24HouseIn the House
2023-10-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (28-22)
2023-10-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2023-10-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-10-04SenateSecond consideration
2023-09-19SenateFirst consideration
2023-09-19SenateReported as amended
2023-02-10SenateReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=340
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0340&pn=0276
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0340&pn=1101
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/SB0340P1101.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=09/19/2023&RollCallId=479
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=09/19/2023&RollCallId=478
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/24/2023&RollCallId=591
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=286

Bill Comments

feedback