PA SB320 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - Act No. 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, enacting the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; providing for user direction and agreements, for disclosure of digital assets and electronic communications, for functions of fiduciaries and for compliance and immunity for custodians of digital assets and electronic communications; and making conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act; providing for user direction and agreements, for disclosure of digital assets and electronic communications, for functions of fiduciaries and for compliance and immunity for custodians of digital assets and electronic communications; and making conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Floor: SB 320 PN 324, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 320 PN 324, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23HouseAct No. 72
2020-07-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-07-13HousePresented to the Governor
2020-07-08HouseSigned in House
2020-07-13HouseSigned in Senate
2020-07-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2020-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-05-20HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-20HouseSecond consideration
2020-05-19HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-04HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-04HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-04HouseReported as committed
2019-10-30HouseReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-10-28HouseIn the House
2019-10-28SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-10-21SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-11SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-11SenateReported as committed
2019-02-27SenateReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=320
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0320&pn=0324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=522
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=297
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/04/2020&RollCallId=1882
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1492
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2020&RollCallId=2341

Bill Comments

feedback