PA SB305 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other criminal provisions, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders; and, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.
Title
In other criminal provisions, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders; and, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for supervisory relationship to offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - SB 305 PN 1187, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-06-18 | House | In the House |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |