PA SB302 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth services, providing for firefighting foam management.
Title
In Commonwealth services, providing for firefighting foam management.
Sponsors
Sen. Gene Yaw [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Lisa Baker [R] |
Sen. Maria Collett [D] | Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] | Sen. Amanda Cappelletti [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04773 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 302 PN 905, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 302 PN 905, Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A04773 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 302 PN 905, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 302 PN 905, Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2022-06-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-09-22 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-09-21 | House | In the House |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Final passage (39-10) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Vote on final passage reconsidered |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (40-9) |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |