PA SB3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in abortion, further providing for definitions, for medical consultation and judgment and for the offense of abortion on unborn child of 24 or more weeks gestational age, providing for dismemberment abortion ban and further providing for reporting.
Title
In abortion, further providing for definitions, for medical consultation and judgment and for the offense of abortion on unborn child of 24 or more weeks gestational age, providing for dismemberment abortion ban and further providing for reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, FP (Y: 121 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, MOT CONST, FRANKEL (Y: 123 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, 2017 A5232, SUSP RULES, DELISSIO (Y: 63 N: 124 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, MOT RECOM, KRUEGER (Y: 70 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, 2017 A5123, MULLERY (Y: 66 N: 123 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: To Postpone til December 12, 2017 (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 3 PN 283, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 3 PN 283, RECOMMIT TO THE COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, MOT CONST, FRANKEL (Y: 123 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, 2017 A5232, SUSP RULES, DELISSIO (Y: 63 N: 124 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, MOT RECOM, KRUEGER (Y: 70 N: 119 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: SB 3 PN 283, 2017 A5123, MULLERY (Y: 66 N: 123 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - House - House Health: To Postpone til December 12, 2017 (Y: 11 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 3 PN 283, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 3 PN 283, RECOMMIT TO THE COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2017-12-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-12-18 | House | Veto No. 3 |
2017-12-18 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2017-12-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-12-13 | House | Signed in House |
2017-12-13 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-12-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (121-70) |
2017-12-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-11 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-11 | House | Second consideration |
2017-12-06 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-04 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to HEALTH |
2017-02-08 | House | In the House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-18) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |