PA SB261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in limitation of time, further providing for six months limitation, for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; and, in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity.
Title
In limitation of time, further providing for six months limitation, for infancy, insanity or imprisonment, for no limitation applicable and for other offenses; and, in matters affecting government units, further providing for exceptions to sovereign immunity and for exceptions to governmental immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 2003, FP (Y: 173 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 2003, REED, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 181 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9177, SCHEMEL (Y: 33 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9351, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 48 N: 145 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9239, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 47 N: 147 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9168, ROZZI (Y: 171 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A697, MURT (Y: 11 N: 183 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00465 (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00550 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00574 (Y: 6 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00539 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 261 PN 243, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 2003, REED, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 181 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9177, SCHEMEL (Y: 33 N: 161 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9351, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 48 N: 145 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9239, SUSP RULES, PETRARCA (Y: 47 N: 147 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A9168, ROZZI (Y: 171 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - House - House Floor: SB 261 PN 631, 2017 A697, MURT (Y: 11 N: 183 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00465 (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00550 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00574 (Y: 6 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00539 (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 261 PN 243, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-25 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-09-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (173-21) |
2018-09-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-09-24 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-09-24 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-09-13 | House | Removed from table |
2017-06-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-04 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-02-01 | House | In the House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |