PA SB259 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Act No. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 20, 1979 (P.L.183, No.60), entitled "An act regulating the terms and conditions of certain leases regarding natural gas and oil," adding definitions; providing for payment information to interest owners for accumulation of proceeds from production, for apportionment and for conflicts; and making editorial changes.
Title
Amending the act of July 20, 1979 (P.L.183, No.60), entitled "An act regulating the terms and conditions of certain leases regarding natural gas and oil," adding definitions; providing for payment information to interest owners for accumulation of proceeds from production, for apportionment and for conflicts; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-30 - Senate - SB 259 PN 1290, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, FP (Y: 167 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, MOT RECON, VITALI (Y: 92 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, 2013 A2739, WHITE (Y: 81 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, 2013 A2700, VITALI (Y: 77 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - SB 259 PN 341, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-29 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, FP (Y: 167 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-28 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, MOT RECON, VITALI (Y: 92 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, 2013 A2739, WHITE (Y: 81 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - House - SB 259 PN 1290, 2013 A2700, VITALI (Y: 77 N: 124 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-02-05 - Senate - SB 259 PN 341, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | Senate | Act No. 66 |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2013-06-30 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (48-2) |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2013-06-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (167-33) |
2013-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2013-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-06-25 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2013-02-05 | House | In the House |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |