PA SB250 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Act No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, in administration of act, providing for unemployment compensation service centers; and, in contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees and for Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund.
Title
In administration of act, providing for unemployment compensation service centers; and, in contributions by employers and employees, further providing for contributions by employees and for Service and Infrastructure Improvement Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 630, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Floor: SB 250 PN 630, FP (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 615, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 541, A573, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-573 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 630, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Floor: SB 250 PN 630, FP (Y: 189 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00625 (Y: 15 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 615, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 250 PN 541, A573, GORDNER AMENDMENT NO. A-573 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | Senate | Act No. 1 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments (41-8) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-04-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-4) |
2017-04-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-03 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-03-29 | House | In the House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (39-8) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments (45-2) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |