PA SB250 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in education empowerment, further providing for mandate waiver program and for expiration.
Title
In education empowerment, further providing for mandate waiver program and for expiration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-08 | First consideration | |
2010-06-08 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to EDUCATION |