PA SB250 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-06-28 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act regulating the amount of property insurance coverage required by certain lenders.
Title
An Act regulating the amount of property insurance coverage required by certain lenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-06-28 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-28 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-28 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-28 | First consideration | |
2008-06-28 | Reported as committed | |
2008-06-18 | Referred to INSURANCE | |
2008-06-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-06-16 | Second consideration | |
2008-06-04 | First consideration | |
2008-06-04 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-08 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=250 |