PA SB229 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in professional employes, further providing for payment of salaries in cases of sickness, injury or death, repealing provisions relating to alternative payment plan, to persons entitled and to salary while on leave and further providing for Distinguished Educators Program.
Title
In professional employes, further providing for payment of salaries in cases of sickness, injury or death, repealing provisions relating to alternative payment plan, to persons entitled and to salary while on leave and further providing for Distinguished Educators Program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Eichelberger [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Donald White [R] |
Sen. Guy Reschenthaler [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |