PA SB22 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated and distinct amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, organizing the Judiciary into representative districts and further providing for residency requirements and for the Legislative Reapportionment Commission for the purpose of reapportioning and redistricting the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated and distinct amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, organizing the Judiciary into representative districts and further providing for residency requirements and for the Legislative Reapportionment Commission for the purpose of reapportioning and redistricting the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1865, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1865, CORMAN APPEAL THE RULING OF THE CHAIR THAT THE QUESTION WAS DIVISIBLE (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1865, REVERT TO PRIOR PRINTER'S NUMBER 397 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7490, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-7490 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7291, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-7291 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7543, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-7543 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7397, SCHWANK AMENDMENT NO. A-7397 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7546, HUGHES AMENDMENT NO. A-7546 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7472, AUMENT AMENDMENT NO. A-7472 (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 22 PN 1780, A7538, FOLMER AMENDMENT NO. A-7538 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-16HouseLaid on the table
2018-10-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-20HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-20HouseReported as committed
2018-06-19HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-13HouseIn the House
2018-06-13SenateThird consideration and final passage (35-14)
2018-06-13SenateMotion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 397 (16-33)
2018-06-12SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-22SenateFirst consideration
2018-05-22SenateReported as amended
2017-02-27SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=22
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0022&pn=0397
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0022&pn=1780
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0022&pn=1865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=05/22/2018&RollCallId=852
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=903
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=538
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=539
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=541
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=552
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=553
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=554
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1793

Bill Comments

feedback