PA SB21 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: House Labor And Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for competitive integrated employment in State and county agencies and any entity providing publicly funded education, training, employment and related services and long-term services and supports for working-age Pennsylvanians with a disability; establishing Employment First, the Governor's Cabinet for People with Disabilities and the Employment First Oversight Commission and providing for their powers and duties; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor and the Office of the Governor.
Title
Providing for competitive integrated employment in State and county agencies and any entity providing publicly funded education, training, employment and related services and long-term services and supports for working-age Pennsylvanians with a disability; establishing Employment First, the Governor's Cabinet for People with Disabilities and the Employment First Oversight Commission and providing for their powers and duties; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor and the Office of the Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 21 PN 1323, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2018-02-06 | House | In the House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |