PA SB208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 97 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 97 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 31, 1968 (P.L.805, No.247), known as the Pennsylvania Municipalities Planning Code, in subdivision and land development, further providing for completion of improvements or guarantee thereof prerequisite to final plat approval.
Title
In subdivision and land development, further providing for completion of improvements or guarantee thereof prerequisite to final plat approval.
Sponsors
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. Robert Mensch [R] | Sen. Camera Bartolotta [R] | Sen. Scott Martin [R] |
Sen. Patrick Stefano [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 208 PN 177, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 208 PN 177, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - House - House Floor: SB 208 PN 177, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 208 PN 177, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | House | Act No. 97 of 2021 |
2021-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-12-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-12-14 | House | Signed in House |
2021-12-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-12-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-12-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-17 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-17 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-16 | House | Removed from table |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-10-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-06-22 | House | In the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |