PA SB207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1967 (P.L.869, No.385), known as the Public Works Contractors' Bond Law of 1967, further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Title
Further providing for duty of prime contractor to provide financial security in certain contracts involving public works and public improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Giovanni DiSanto [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Judy Schwank [D] |
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Patrick Browne [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |