PA SB166 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Third consideration and defeated on final passage (90-102)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for protection of paychecks of certain workers and for the collection of political contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for protection of paychecks of certain workers and for the collection of political contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-12 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, FP (Y: 90 N: 102 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4870, KRUEGER-BRANEKY, A04870-2 (Y: 71 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4938, SNYDER (Y: 72 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4912, DALEY (Y: 70 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4876, BRADFORD (Y: 80 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4875, KRUEGER-BRANEKY (Y: 75 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4869, DEAN (Y: 83 N: 105 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4863, BRADFORD (Y: 71 N: 119 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4854, CONKLIN (Y: 76 N: 110 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4852, STURLA (Y: 75 N: 112 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4851, BRADFORD, MOT APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 116 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: SB 166 PN 1344, 2017 A4836, BRADFORD, MOT APPEAL CHAIR (Y: 117 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A04821 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00622 (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-11-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04821 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 271, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 271, A187, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-0187 (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 166 PN 271, A189, COSTA AMENDMENT NO. A-00189 (Y: 16 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12HouseThird consideration and defeated on final passage (90-102)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-05HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as amended
2017-02-13HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-02-08HouseIn the House
2017-02-08SenateThird consideration and final passage (28-22)
2017-02-06SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-02-01SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-01SenateSecond consideration
2017-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2017-01-31SenateReported as amended
2017-01-20SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=166
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0166&pn=0139
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0166&pn=0271
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0166&pn=1344
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=01/31/2017&RollCallId=22
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=39
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=32
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=33
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=34
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1070
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1071
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=11/21/2017&RollCallId=1072
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=865
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=866
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=867
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=868
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=869
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=870
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=871
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=872
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=873
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=874
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=875
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1160
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=933

Bill Comments

feedback