PA SB155 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 40 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 40 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 12 (Commerce and Trade) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.
Title
In Pennsylvania Military Community Enhancement Commission, further providing for establishment and membership.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Mastriano [R] | Sen. John Blake [D] | Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Ryan Aument [R] |
Sen. Joe Pittman [R] | Sen. Devlin Robinson [R] | Sen. Mario Scavello [R] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 155 PN 227, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 155 PN 227, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - House - House Floor: SB 155 PN 227, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 155 PN 227, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Act No. 40 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-29 | House | Signed in House |
2022-06-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-27 | House | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-27 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2021-02-24 | House | In the House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-02-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |