PA SB1491 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-15 - Third consideration and final passage (32-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-15 - Third consideration and final passage (32-16)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 14, 1963 (P.L.1059, No.459), referred to as the Cemetery and Funeral Merchandise Trust Fund Law, further providing for deposits into merchandise trust funds; providing for price and description reports; and further providing for payments from merchandise trust funds, for filing of financial reports and for penalty.
Title
Further providing for deposits into merchandise trust funds; providing for price and description reports; and further providing for payments from merchandise trust funds, for filing of financial reports and for penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Edwin Erickson [R] | Sen. Randy Vulakovich [R] | Sen. Dominic Pileggi [R] | Sen. John Rafferty [R] |
Sen. Jay Costa [D] | Sen. Timothy Solobay [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (32-16) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-10-01 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |