PA SB1490 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," further providing for composition of commission and for powers; and providing for veto power by the Governor.
Title
A Supplement to the act of June 12, 1931 (P.L.575, No.200), entitled "An act providing for joint action by Pennsylvania and New Jersey in the development of the ports on the lower Delaware River, and the improvement of the facilities for transportation across the river; authorizing the Governor, for these purposes, to enter into an agreement with New Jersey; creating The Delaware River Joint Commission and specifying the powers and duties thereof, including the power to finance projects by the issuance of revenue bonds; transferring to the new commission all the powers of the Delaware River Bridge Joint Commission; and making an appropriation," further providing for composition of commission and for powers; and providing for veto power by the Governor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 1490 PN 2263, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Second consideration | |
2010-10-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-10-12 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-10-12 | First consideration | |
2010-10-12 | Reported as committed | |
2010-10-08 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |