PA SB1481 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-18 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, prohibiting private transfer fee obligations; and providing for notice and disclosure of existing private transfer fee obligations.
Title
Prohibiting private transfer fee obligations; and providing for notice and disclosure of existing private transfer fee obligations.
Sponsors
Sen. David Argall [R] | Sen. Jim Ferlo [D] | Sen. Michael Folmer [R] | Sen. Wayne Fontana [D] |
Sen. Shirley Kitchen [D] | Sen. Leanna Washington [D] | Sen. Gene Yaw [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-10-14 - Senate - SB 1481 PN 2219, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-18 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-28 | First consideration | |
2010-09-28 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-24 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |