PA SB147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in health and safety, further providing for certification of safety committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In health and safety, further providing for certification of safety committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 685, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 685, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 252, Motion to Agree to the Bill on Second Consideration (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAct No. 57
2021-06-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-24HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-22HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-22HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-22HouseReported as committed
2021-05-14HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2021-05-10HouseIn the House
2021-05-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2021-04-27SenateRe-reported as amended
2021-03-16SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-16SenateSecond consideration, *Opening vote* March 16, 2021 (48-0)
2021-02-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-02-23SenateReported as amended
2021-01-29SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=147
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=0126
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=0252
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=0685
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=S&type=B&bn=0147&pn=0126&aYear=2021&an=00347
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/SB0147P0685.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/SB0147P0685.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=02/23/2021&RollCallId=32
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=50
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=147
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=97
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=720
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=447
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=797

Bill Comments

feedback