PA SB147 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for accountability; and, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for hunting on Sunday prohibited and for trespass on private property while hunting and providing for hunting on Sunday without written permission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Game Commission, further providing for accountability; and, in hunting and furtaking, further providing for hunting on Sunday prohibited and for trespass on private property while hunting and providing for hunting on Sunday without written permission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 1354, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 1354, FP (Y: 144 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 1329, 2019 A3567, KORTZ (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 1283, 2019 A3454, OWLETT (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 1283, 2019 A3439, MALONEY (Y: 193 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-28 - House - House Floor: SB 147 PN 1283, 2019 A3369, PEIFER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Amended A02923 (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Adopt Amendment A02923 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 1066, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 195, A2534, LAUGHLIN AMENDMENT NO. A-2534 RECONSIDERED (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: SB 147 PN 195, A2534, LAUGHLIN AMENDMENT NO. A-2534 (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27SenateAct No. 107
2019-11-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-11-19SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-11-19SenateSigned in House
2019-11-18SenateSigned in Senate
2019-11-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (38-11)
2019-11-18SenateRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-11-18SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2019-10-30SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-30HouseFinal passage (144-54)
2019-10-30HouseThird consideration, with amendments
2019-10-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-28HouseRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-28HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-28HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-22HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-22HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-22HouseReported as amended
2019-06-27HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2019-06-26HouseIn the House
2019-06-26SenateThird consideration and final passage (36-14)
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration, with amendments (37-13)
2019-06-25SenateVote by which amendment adopted reconsidered
2019-06-25SenateVote on second consideration reconsidered
2019-06-25SenateSecond consideration, with amendments (38-12)
2019-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-03-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-02-05SenateFirst consideration
2019-02-05SenateReported as amended
2019-02-01SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=S&type=B&bn=147
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=0125
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=0195
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=1066
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=1283
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=1329
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=S&billTyp=B&billNbr=0147&pn=1354
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=02/05/2019&RollCallId=18
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=188
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=194
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=204
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=1191
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=10/21/2019&RollCallId=1192
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=771
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=773
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=1305
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=814
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=815
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=627
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=326

Bill Comments

feedback